Identification
Personal identification
- Full name
- Duarte Manuel da Silva Mendonça
Citation names
- Mendonça, D
- Mendonça, Duarte
- Duarte Mendonça
Author identifiers
- Ciência ID
- 5718-47A3-1BF4
- ORCID iD
- 0000-0003-1478-630X
- Researcher Id
- I-7168-2013
- Scopus Author Id
- 15822204700
Email addresses
- duarte.ms.mendonca@uac.pt (Professional)
Websites
- http://cba.uac.pt/p/DuarteMSMendonca (Professional)
Education
Degree | Classification | |
---|---|---|
2005/06/05
Concluded
|
AGRICULTURAL SCIENCES - GENETICS AND BREEDING (Doutoramento)
Universidade dos Açores, Portugal
"Evaluation of different pathogen.-derived resistance to Plum pox virus (PPV)" (THESIS/DISSERTATION)
|
|
1997/04
Concluded
|
Agricultural Engineering (Licenciatura)
Universidade dos Açores, Portugal
"Diagnose de doenças virais em pomares de prunóideas dos Açores" (THESIS/DISSERTATION)
|
Affiliation
Science
Category Host institution |
Employer | |
---|---|---|
2020/12/18 - Current | Auxiliary Researcher (Research) | Universidade dos Açores - Campus de Angra do Heroísmo, Portugal |
Universidade dos Açores - Centro de Biotecnologia dos Açores, Portugal | ||
2015/10 - 2020/12/17 | Postdoc (Research) | Fundação para a Ciência e a Tecnologia, Portugal |
Universidade dos Açores - Centro de Biotecnologia dos Açores, Portugal | ||
2009/10/01 - 2015/09/30 | Postdoc (Research) | Fundo Regional para a Ciência e Tecnologia, Portugal |
Universidade dos Açores - Centro de Biotecnologia dos Açores, Portugal | ||
2005/10/01 - 2009/09/30 | Postdoc (Research) | Direção Regional da Ciência e Tecnologia , Portugal |
Universidade dos Açores - Centro de Biotecnologia dos Açores, Portugal | ||
2003/01 - 2006/09 | Researcher (Research) | Universidade dos Açores, Portugal |
Teaching in Higher Education
Category Host institution |
Employer | |
---|---|---|
2014 - 2016 | Invited Assistant Professor (University Teacher) | Universidade dos Açores - Campus de Angra do Heroísmo, Portugal |
Positions / Appointments
Category Host institution |
Employer | |
---|---|---|
2021/04/19 - Current | Director | Universidade dos Açores Centro de Biotecnologia dos Açores, Portugal |
Universidade dos Açores - Centro de Biotecnologia dos Açores, Portugal |
Others
Category Host institution |
Employer | |
---|---|---|
1998/11/01 - 2002/10/31 | PhD Fellow | Fundação para a Ciência e a Tecnologia, Portugal |